CA ACR172 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on August 2 2010 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-08-02 - In Senate. To Com. on RLS.
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on August 2 2010 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-08-02 - In Senate. To Com. on RLS.
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to the Ernest N. Mobley Memorial Interchange.
Title
Ernest N. Mobley Memorial Interchange.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-08-02 - Assembly - ACR 172 VILLINES Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-06-30 - Assembly - Be adopted, to Consent Calendar (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-06-14 - Assembly - Be adopted, and re-refer to Committee on Appropriations with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-06-30 - Assembly - Be adopted, to Consent Calendar (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-06-14 - Assembly - Be adopted, and re-refer to Committee on Appropriations with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-08-02 | In Senate. To Com. on RLS. | |
2010-08-02 | Adopted and to Senate. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 6006.) | |
2010-06-30 | From committee: Be adopted. To Consent Calendar. (June 30). | |
2010-06-15 | From committee: Be adopted, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. Re-referred. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (June 14). | |
2010-06-03 | Referred to Com. on TRANS. | |
2010-06-02 | From printer. | |
2010-06-01 | Introduced. To print. |