CA ACR166 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 47-18-1)
Status: Passed on June 2 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-02 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 66, Statutes of 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 47-18-1)
Status: Passed on June 2 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-02 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 66, Statutes of 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to Child Abuse Prevention Month.
Title
Child Abuse Prevention Month.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-05-23 - Senate - Special Consent ACR166 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-04-21 - Assembly - ACR 166 Calderon Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 68 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2022-04-07 - Assembly - Be adopted. To Consent Calendar (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-04-21 - Assembly - ACR 166 Calderon Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 68 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2022-04-07 - Assembly - Be adopted. To Consent Calendar (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-02 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 66, Statutes of 2022. | |
2022-06-01 | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 2 p.m. | |
2022-05-24 | Assembly | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. |
2022-05-23 | Senate | Adopted and to Assembly. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 3843.) |
2022-05-17 | Senate | Ordered to special consent calendar. |
2022-05-04 | Senate | From committee: Ordered to third reading. |
2022-04-25 | Senate | In Senate. To Com. on RLS. |
2022-04-21 | Assembly | Adopted and to Senate. (Ayes 68. Noes 0. Page 4372.) |
2022-04-21 | Assembly | Coauthors revised. |
2022-04-07 | Assembly | From committee: Be adopted. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (April 7). |
2022-03-24 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on RLS. |
2022-03-22 | Assembly | From printer. |
2022-03-21 | Assembly | Introduced. To print. |