CA ACR145 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 59-18-1)
Status: Passed on February 20 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-02-20 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 9, Statutes of 2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 59-18-1)
Status: Passed on February 20 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-02-20 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 9, Statutes of 2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to Maternal Health Awareness Day.
Title
Maternal Health Awareness Day.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-14 - Senate - Special Consent ACR145 (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-17 - Assembly - Be adopted. To third reading (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-17 - Assembly - Be adopted. To third reading (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-20 | Assembly | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 9, Statutes of 2020. |
2020-02-20 | Assembly | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 2 p.m. |
2020-02-19 | Assembly | Enrolled measure version corrected. |
2020-02-14 | Assembly | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. |
2020-02-14 | Senate | Adopted and to Assembly. (Ayes 34. Noes 0. Page 3233.) |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Ordered to special consent calendar. |
2020-02-06 | Senate | From committee: Ordered to third reading. |
2020-01-27 | Senate | In Senate. To Com. on RLS. |
2020-01-23 | Assembly | Adopted and to Senate. (Page 3866.) |
2020-01-23 | Assembly | Coauthors revised. |
2020-01-17 | Assembly | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to Third Reading. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (January 17). |
2020-01-09 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on RLS. |
2020-01-08 | Assembly | From printer. |
2020-01-07 | Assembly | Introduced. To print. |