CA ACR140 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 58-19)
Status: Passed on February 13 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-02-13 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 5, Statutes of 2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Relative to Positive Parenting Awareness Month.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Positive Parenting Awareness Month.

Sponsors

Asm. Tim Grayson [D]Asm. Mark Stone [D]Asm. Cecilia Aguiar-Curry [D]Asm. Joaquin Arambula [D]
Sen. Patricia Bates [R]Asm. Rebecca Bauer-Kahan [D]Asm. Marc Berman [D]Asm. Franklin Bigelow [R]
Asm. Blanca Rubio [D]Asm. Richard Bloom [D]Asm. Tasha Horvath [D]Asm. Autumn Burke [D]
Asm. Ian Calderon [D]Asm. Wendy Carrillo [D]Asm. Edwin Chau [D]Asm. Phillip Chen [R]
Asm. David Chiu [D]Asm. Steven Choi [R]Asm. Kansen Chu [D]Asm. Ken Cooley [D]
Asm. Cristina Garcia [D]Asm. Jordan Cunningham [R]Asm. Tom Daly [D]Asm. Tyler Diep [R]
Sen. Bill Dodd [D]Asm. Eduardo Garcia [D]Asm. Susan Eggman [D]Asm. Heath Flora [R]
Asm. Vince Fong [R]Asm. Jim Frazier [D]Asm. Laura Friedman [D]Asm. Jesse Gabriel [D]
Asm. James Gallagher [R]Asm. Mike Gipson [D]Asm. Todd Gloria [D]Asm. Lorena Gonzalez Fletcher [D]
Asm. Adam Gray [D]Asm. Chris Holden [D]Asm. Jacqui Irwin [D]Asm. Reginald Jones-Sawyer [D]
Asm. Ash Kalra [D]Asm. Sydney Kamlager-Dove [D]Asm. Kevin Kiley [R]Asm. Tom Lackey [R]
Asm. Marc Levine [D]Asm. Monique Limon [D]Asm. Evan Low [D]Asm. Luz Rivas [D]
Asm. Brian Maienschein [R]Asm. Devon Mathis [R]Asm. Chad Mayes [R]Asm. Kevin McCarty [D]
Asm. Jose Medina [D]Asm. Melissa Melendez [R]Asm. Kevin Mullin [D]Asm. Al Muratsuchi [D]
Asm. Adrin Nazarian [D]Asm. Patrick O'Donnell [D]Asm. Jay Obernolte [R]Asm. Jim Patterson [R]
Asm. Cottie Petrie-Norris [D]Asm. Bill Quirk [D]Asm. Sharon Quirk-Silva [D]Asm. James Ramos [D]
Asm. Anthony Rendon [D]Asm. Eloise Reyes [D]Asm. Robert Rivas [D]Asm. Freddie Rodriguez [D]
Asm. Rudy Salas [D]Sen. Nancy Skinner [D]Asm. Christy Smith [D]Asm. Philip Ting [D]
Asm. Randy Voepel [R]Asm. Marie Waldron [R]Asm. Shirley Weber [D]Asm. Buffy Wicks [D]
Asm. Jim Wood [D]

Roll Calls

2020-02-10 - Assembly - ACR 140 Mark Stone Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 65 N: 0 NV: 15 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-06 - Senate - Special Consent ACR140 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-09 - Assembly - Be adopted. To third reading (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-02-13AssemblyChaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 5, Statutes of 2020.
2020-02-13AssemblyEnrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 2 p.m.
2020-02-10AssemblySenate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 65. Noes 0. Page 3998.).
2020-02-06AssemblyIn Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending.
2020-02-06SenateAdopted and to Assembly. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 3201.)
2020-02-04SenateOrdered to special consent calendar.
2020-01-30SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2020-01-29SenateRead third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
2020-01-22SenateFrom committee: Ordered to third reading.
2020-01-14SenateIn Senate. To Com. on RLS.
2020-01-13AssemblyAdopted and to Senate. (Page 3788.)
2020-01-13AssemblyCoauthors revised.
2020-01-09AssemblyFrom committee: Be adopted. Ordered to Third Reading. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (January 9).
2020-01-09AssemblyReferred to Com. on RLS.
2020-01-07AssemblyFrom printer.
2020-01-06AssemblyIntroduced. To print.

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback