CA ACR119 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 14 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-09-14 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 38, Statutes of 2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 14 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-09-14 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 38, Statutes of 2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to Officer Justin Kepler Memorial Highway.
Title
Officer Justin Kepler Memorial Highway.
Sponsors
Asm. Heath Flora [R] |
Roll Calls
2020-08-30 - Assembly - ACR 119 Flora Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-28 - Senate - Special Consent ACR119 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-04 - Senate - Be adopted, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 13 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-09-14 - Assembly - ACR 119 Flora Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-09-11 - Assembly - Be adopted. To Consent Calendar (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-28 - Senate - Special Consent ACR119 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-04 - Senate - Be adopted, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 13 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-09-14 - Assembly - ACR 119 Flora Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-09-11 - Assembly - Be adopted. To Consent Calendar (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-09-14 | Assembly | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 38, Statutes of 2020. |
2020-09-14 | Assembly | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 11 a.m. |
2020-08-30 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 75. Noes 0. Page 5333.). |
2020-08-28 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. |
2020-08-28 | Senate | Adopted and to Assembly. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 4386.) |
2020-08-25 | Senate | Ordered to special consent calendar. |
2020-08-14 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2020-08-13 | Senate | From committee: Be ordered to second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2020-08-04 | Senate | From committee: Be adopted, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 13. Noes 1.) (August 4). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2020-07-30 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Amended and re-referred to Com. on TRANS. |
2020-02-12 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on TRANS. |
2019-09-14 | Senate | In Senate. To Com. on RLS. |
2019-09-14 | Assembly | Adopted and to Senate. (Ayes 75. Noes 0. Page 3618.) |
2019-09-11 | Assembly | From committee: Be adopted. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (September 11). |
2019-08-15 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on TRANS. |
2019-08-13 | Assembly | From printer. |
2019-08-12 | Assembly | Introduced. To print. |