CA ACR114 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 52-11)
Status: Passed on May 21 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-21 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 35, Statutes of 2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 52-11)
Status: Passed on May 21 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-21 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 35, Statutes of 2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to César Chávez.
Title
César Chávez.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-05-15 - Assembly - ACR 114 CAMPOS Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2014-05-08 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading ACR114 Campos By Lara (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-13 - Assembly - From committee: Be adopted. To third reading (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-05-08 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading ACR114 Campos By Lara (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-13 - Assembly - From committee: Be adopted. To third reading (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-21 | Assembly | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 35, Statutes of 2014. |
2014-05-21 | Assembly | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 3:30 p.m. |
2014-05-15 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 4925.). |
2014-05-08 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. |
2014-05-08 | Senate | Adopted and to Assembly. (Ayes 34. Noes 0. Page 3414.) |
2014-05-01 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2014-04-30 | Senate | Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2014-04-10 | Senate | From committee: Ordered to third reading. |
2014-04-01 | Senate | In Senate. To Com. on RLS. |
2014-03-28 | Assembly | Amended, adopted, and to Senate. (Page 4235.) |
2014-03-13 | Assembly | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to third reading. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (March 13). |
2014-03-10 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on RLS. |
2014-02-26 | Assembly | From printer. |
2014-02-25 | Assembly | Introduced. To print. |