CA ACR110 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on August 30 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-08-30 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 108, Statutes of 2010.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on August 30 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-08-30 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 108, Statutes of 2010.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to Step Up California Month and Step Up California Day.
Title
Step Up California Month and Step Up California Day.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-08-18 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading ACR110 Conway By Liu (Y: 26 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-04-27 - Assembly - From committee: Be adopted. To third reading (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-04-27 - Assembly - From committee: Be adopted. To third reading (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-08-30 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 108, Statutes of 2010. | |
2010-08-30 | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 4:30 p.m. | |
2010-08-18 | In Assembly. To enrollment. | |
2010-08-18 | Adopted and to Assembly. (Ayes 26. Noes 4. Page 4600.) | |
2010-08-02 | Withdrawn from committee. Ordered placed on third reading file. | |
2010-05-24 | In Senate. To Com. on RLS. | |
2010-05-24 | Adopted and to Senate. (Page 5289.) | |
2010-05-20 | Read and amended. (Page 5239.) | |
2010-04-28 | From committee: Be adopted. To third reading. (Ayes 4. Noes 1.) (April 27). | |
2010-02-04 | Referred to Com. on HUM. S. | |
2010-01-28 | From printer. | |
2010-01-27 | Introduced. To print. |