CA ACR105 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 23-5)
Status: Passed on April 27 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-27 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 9, Statutes of 2010.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 23-5)
Status: Passed on April 27 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-27 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 9, Statutes of 2010.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to Perinatal Depression Awareness Month.
Title
Perinatal Depression Awareness Month.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-04-22 - Assembly - ACR 105 NAVA Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 73 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-04-15 - Senate - W/O REF. TO FILE ACR105 Nava (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-04-05 - Assembly - ACR 105 NAVA Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-23 - Assembly - Be adopted, to Consent Calendar (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-04-15 - Senate - W/O REF. TO FILE ACR105 Nava (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-04-05 - Assembly - ACR 105 NAVA Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-23 - Assembly - Be adopted, to Consent Calendar (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-27 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 9, Statutes of 2010. | |
2010-04-27 | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 2:45 p.m. | |
2010-04-22 | Senate amendments concurred in. To enrollment. (Ayes 73. Noes 0. Page 4788.) | |
2010-04-15 | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. | |
2010-04-15 | Withdrawn from committee. Ordered to Special Consent Calendar. Adopted and to Assembly. (Ayes 35. Noes 0. Page 3198.) | |
2010-04-12 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Amended and re-referred to Com. on RLS. | |
2010-04-05 | In Senate. To Com. on RLS. | |
2010-04-05 | Adopted and to Senate. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 4452.) | |
2010-03-24 | From committee: Be adopted. To Consent Calendar. (March 23). | |
2010-03-10 | Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH. | |
2010-03-09 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HEALTH. Amended. | |
2010-01-27 | Referred to Com. on HEALTH. | |
2010-01-21 | From printer. | |
2010-01-20 | Introduced. To print. |