CA ACR103 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on August 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-28 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 169, Statutes of 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on August 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-28 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 169, Statutes of 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to the Matthew “SLOStringer” Frank Memorial Highway.
Title
Matthew “SLOStringer” Frank Memorial Highway.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-08-23 - Assembly - ACR 103 CUNNINGHAM Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-13 - Senate - Consent Calendar ACR103 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-07-03 - Senate - Be adopted, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-07-13 - Assembly - ACR 103 CUNNINGHAM Consent Calendar Second Day (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-07-10 - Assembly - Be adopted. To Consent Calendar (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-13 - Senate - Consent Calendar ACR103 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-07-03 - Senate - Be adopted, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-07-13 - Assembly - ACR 103 CUNNINGHAM Consent Calendar Second Day (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-07-10 - Assembly - Be adopted. To Consent Calendar (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-08-28 | Assembly | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 169, Statutes of 2018. |
2018-08-28 | Assembly | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 2 p.m. |
2018-08-23 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 6488.). |
2018-08-14 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. |
2018-08-13 | Senate | Adopted and to Assembly. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 5277.) |
2018-08-07 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2018-08-06 | Senate | From committee: Be ordered to second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2018-07-03 | Senate | From committee: Be adopted, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (July 3). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2017-07-20 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Amended and re-referred to Com. on T. & H. |
2017-07-19 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on T. & H. |
2017-07-13 | Senate | In Senate. To Com. on RLS. |
2017-07-13 | Assembly | Adopted and to Senate. (Ayes 75. Noes 0. Page 2541.) |
2017-07-11 | Assembly | From committee: Be adopted. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (July 10). |
2017-06-26 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on TRANS. |
2017-06-22 | Assembly | From printer. |
2017-06-21 | Assembly | Introduced. To print. |