CA ACA6 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 47-1)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-06-11 - In committee: Set, second hearing. Failed passage.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-06-11 - In committee: Set, second hearing. Failed passage.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
A resolution to propose to the people of the State of California an amendment to the Constitution of the State, by adding subdivision (h) to Section 9 of Article IX thereof, relating to the University of California.
Title
University of California: basic state labor standards.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-06-11 - Senate - Be adopted, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 2 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2023-09-11 - Senate - [First] hearing set for [09-11-2023]: Failed passage in Committee. Reconsideration granted (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-09-11 - Senate - Be adopted, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 3 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-06-28 - Senate - Be adopted, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Elections and Constitutional Amendments] (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-31 - Assembly - ACA 6 Haney Assembly Third Reading (Y: 67 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2023-05-18 - Assembly - Be adopted (Y: 11 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-04-26 - Assembly - Be adopted and re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-09-11 - Senate - [First] hearing set for [09-11-2023]: Failed passage in Committee. Reconsideration granted (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-09-11 - Senate - Be adopted, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 3 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-06-28 - Senate - Be adopted, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Elections and Constitutional Amendments] (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-31 - Assembly - ACA 6 Haney Assembly Third Reading (Y: 67 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2023-05-18 - Assembly - Be adopted (Y: 11 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-04-26 - Assembly - Be adopted and re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-06-11 | Senate | In committee: Set, second hearing. Failed passage. |
2023-09-11 | Senate | In committee: Set, first hearing. Failed passage. Reconsideration granted. |
2023-09-07 | Senate | Joint Rules 61 and 62(a) suspended. (Ayes 32. Noes 8. Page 2460.) |
2023-08-31 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on E. & C.A. |
2023-08-22 | Senate | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2023-07-12 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on E. & C.A. |
2023-06-28 | Senate | From committee: Be adopted, and re-refer to Com. on E. & C.A. Re-referred. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (June 28). Re-referred to Com. on E. & C.A. |
2023-06-20 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on L., P.E. & R. |
2023-06-15 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on L., P.E. & R. |
2023-06-14 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on L., P.E. & R. and E. & C.A. |
2023-06-01 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2023-05-31 | Assembly | Ordered to the Senate. |
2023-05-31 | Assembly | Read third time. Adopted. (Ayes 67. Noes 7. Page 2030.) |
2023-05-18 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2023-05-18 | Assembly | From committee: Be adopted. (Ayes 11. Noes 3.) (May 18). |
2023-05-18 | Assembly | Coauthors revised. |
2023-05-10 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2023-04-27 | Assembly | From committee: Be adopted, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Re-referred. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (April 26). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2023-04-27 | Assembly | Coauthors revised. |
2023-04-13 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on L. & E. |
2023-02-17 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 19. |
2023-02-16 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |