CA ACA25 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 30-2)
Status: Introduced on May 21 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-06-15 - Measure version as amended on June 4 corrected.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 21 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-06-15 - Measure version as amended on June 4 corrected.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
A resolution to propose to the people of the State of California an amendment to the Constitution of the State, by adding Section 21.5 to Article IV thereof, relating to the Legislature.
Title
State of emergency: remote legislative proceedings.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-06-10 - Assembly - ACA 25 Mullin Assembly Third Reading (Y: 60 N: 13 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-03 - Assembly - Be adopted as amended (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-03 - Assembly - Be adopted as amended (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-15 | Senate | Measure version as amended on June 4 corrected. |
2020-06-10 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2020-06-10 | Assembly | Ordered to the Senate. |
2020-06-10 | Assembly | Read third time. Adopted. (Ayes 60. Noes 13. Page 4765.) |
2020-06-08 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2020-06-04 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading. |
2020-06-03 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and be adopted as amended. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (June 3). |
2020-05-26 | Assembly | Joint Rule 55 suspended. (Ayes 74. Noes 0. Page 4599.) |
2020-05-26 | Assembly | Art. IV, Sec. 8(a) of the Constitution dispensed with. |
2020-05-26 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on RLS. |
2020-05-22 | Assembly | Introduced measure version corrected. |
2020-05-22 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee June 21. |
2020-05-21 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |