CA ACA11 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Introduced on March 8 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-05-09 - Re-referred to Com. on REV. & TAX.
Pending: Assembly Revenue and Taxation Committee
Hearing: Jun 12 @ 2:30 pm in State Capitol, Room 437
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 8 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-05-09 - Re-referred to Com. on REV. & TAX.
Pending: Assembly Revenue and Taxation Committee
Hearing: Jun 12 @ 2:30 pm in State Capitol, Room 437
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
A resolution to propose to the people of the State of California an amendment to the Constitution of the State, by amending Section 14 of Article II thereof, by amending Section 8 of Article III thereof, by amending Section 18 of Article IV thereof, by amending Sections 5 and 14 of Article V thereof, by amending Section 10 of Article VII thereof, by amending Sections 3, 11, 18, 19, and 28 of, and amending, repealing, and adding Section 17 of, Article XIII thereof, by amending Section 2.1 of Article XIII A thereof, by amending Section 10 of Article XVI thereof, by amending Section 22 of Article XX thereof, and by amending Sections 1 and 2 of, and by amending the heading of, Article XXI thereof, relating to taxation.
Title
State tax agency.
Sponsors
Asm. Jacqui Irwin [D] | Asm. Cottie Petrie-Norris [D] | Asm. Philip Ting [D] | Sen. Josh Newman [D] |
Asm. Marc Berman [D] | Asm. Evan Low [D] | Asm. Kevin McCarty [D] | Asm. Jim Wood [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-09 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on REV. & TAX. |
2023-05-08 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on REV. & TAX. Read second time and amended. |
2023-05-04 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on REV. & TAX. and ELECTIONS. |
2023-03-09 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee April 8. |
2023-03-08 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |