CA ACA10 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 6 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-06-13 - Ordered to third reading.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

A resolution directing the Secretary of State to make amendments in Assembly Constitutional Amendment No. 1 (Resolution Chapter 173 of the Statutes of 2023) relating to housing.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Local government financing: affordable housing and public infrastructure: voter approval.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2024-05-16 - Assembly - Be adopted (Y: 11 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-06-07 - Assembly - Be adopted and re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2024-06-13AssemblyOrdered to third reading.
2024-06-13AssemblyWithdrawn from committee.
2024-06-13AssemblyAssembly Rule 96 suspended.
2024-06-13AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on RLS. Read second time and amended.
2024-06-06AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Assembly Rule 97.
2024-05-20AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2024-05-16AssemblyFrom committee: Be adopted. (Ayes 11. Noes 4.) (May 16).
2024-05-16AssemblyJoint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended.
2024-05-15AssemblyIn committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to suspense file.
2023-06-07AssemblyFrom committee: Be adopted, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Re-referred. (Ayes 6. Noes 2.) (June 7). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2023-06-07AssemblyCoauthors revised.
2023-04-20AssemblyReferred to Com. on H. & C.D.
2023-03-07AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee April 6.
2023-03-06AssemblyRead first time. To print.

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback