CA AB977 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 18 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-02-01 - Died pursuant to Art. IV, Sec. 10(c) of the Constitution. From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 18 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-02-01 - Died pursuant to Art. IV, Sec. 10(c) of the Constitution. From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 71.3 to the Harbors and Navigation Code, relating to harbors and ports.
Title
Harbors and ports: loans: OC Dana Point Harbor.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-02-01 | Died pursuant to Art. IV, Sec. 10(c) of the Constitution. From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56. | |
2011-04-26 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | |
2011-04-04 | Re-referred to Com. on W., P. & W. | |
2011-03-31 | Referred to Com. on W., P. & W. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on W., P. & W. Read second time and amended. | |
2011-02-20 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 22. | |
2011-02-18 | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Harbors and Navigation Code | 71.3 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Water Code | 11910 | Amended Code | Citation Text |