CA AB958 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 1 2017 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-08-21 - Ordered to inactive file at the request of Senator Pan.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

An act to add Chapter 14 (commencing with Section 108970) to Part 3 of Division 104 of the Health and Safety Code, relating to product safety.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Product safety: perfluoroalkyl and polyfluoroalkyl substances.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-06-20 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-07-05 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-01 - Assembly - AB 958 TING Assembly Third Reading (Y: 44 N: 28 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-26 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 11 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-25 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-08-21SenateOrdered to inactive file at the request of Senator Pan.
2018-06-26SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2018-06-25SenateOrdered to second reading.
2018-06-25SenateWithdrawn from committee.
2018-06-21SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (June 20). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2018-06-13SenateRe-referred to Com. on EQ.
2018-06-04SenateRe-referred to Com. on RLS.
2018-06-04SenateWithdrawn from committee.
2018-05-31SenateFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2017-08-21SenateIn committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
2017-07-17SenateRead second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2017-07-13SenateFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (July 5).
2017-06-21SenateFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on EQ.
2017-06-14SenateReferred to Com. on EQ.
2017-06-05SenateIn Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2017-06-01AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 44. Noes 28. Page 2057.)
2017-05-30AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2017-05-26AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 11. Noes 6.) (May 26).
2017-05-26AssemblyCoauthors revised.
2017-05-10AssemblyIn committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
2017-04-26AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (April 25). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2017-04-26AssemblyCoauthors revised.
2017-04-24AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on E.S. & T.M.
2017-04-20AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on E.S. & T.M. Read second time and amended.
2017-03-22AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on E.S. & T.M.
2017-03-21AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on E.S. & T.M. Read second time and amended.
2017-03-20AssemblyReferred to Com. on E.S. & T.M.
2017-02-17AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee March 19.
2017-02-16AssemblyRead first time. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Health and Safety Code108970New CodeSee Bill Text
Health and Safety Code110380Amended CodeCitation Text
Health and Safety Code25257.5New CodeSee Bill Text
Health and Safety Code25258.5New CodeSee Bill Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback