CA AB958 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on September 21 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-09-21 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 307, Statutes of 2015.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on September 21 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-09-21 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 307, Statutes of 2015.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 67002, 67041, 67042, 67051, 67052, 67053, 67054, 67055, 67056, 67059, 67060, 67132, 67134, 76600, 76602, 76604, 76650, 76651, 76652, 76700, 76701, 76702, 76705, 76706, 76707, 76708, 76709, 76712, 76714, 76715, 76716, 76717, 76718, 76750, 76800, 76851, 76852, 76900, 76901, 76901.5, 76903, 76904, 76904.5, 76905, 76906, 76907, 76908, 76909, and 76910 of, to add Sections 67052.3 and 67052.5 to, to add Article 9.5 (commencing with Section 76961), Article 10 (commencing with Section 76971), and Article 11 (commencing with Section 76981) to Chapter 16 of Part 2 of Division 22 of, to repeal Sections 67043 and 67044 of, and to repeal and add Article 9 (commencing with Section 76950) of Chapter 16 of Part 2 of Division 22 of, the Food and Agricultural Code, relating to agriculture, and making an appropriation therefor.
Title
Agriculture: California Avocado Commission: California
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2015-08-24 - Assembly - AB 958 AGRI. Concurrence in Senate Amendments By PEREA (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-08-20 - Senate - Consent Calendar 2nd AB958 Committee On AGRI. (Galgiani) By Pan (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-07-07 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations Recommend Consent (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-22 - Assembly - AB 958 AGRI. Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 74 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2015-05-13 - Assembly - Do pass as amended, to Consent Calendar (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-29 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-08-20 - Senate - Consent Calendar 2nd AB958 Committee On AGRI. (Galgiani) By Pan (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-07-07 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations Recommend Consent (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-22 - Assembly - AB 958 AGRI. Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 74 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2015-05-13 - Assembly - Do pass as amended, to Consent Calendar (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-29 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-09-21 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 307, Statutes of 2015. | |
2015-09-21 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2015-09-01 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m. |
2015-08-24 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 2559.). |
2015-08-20 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 22 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. |
2015-08-20 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 2118.). |
2015-08-18 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2015-08-17 | Senate | From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to consent calendar. |
2015-07-07 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (July 7). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2015-06-29 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on AGRI. |
2015-06-04 | Senate | Referred to Com. on AGRI. |
2015-05-22 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2015-05-22 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 74. Noes 0. Page 1565.) |
2015-05-19 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2015-05-18 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading. |
2015-05-14 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (May 13). |
2015-05-05 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2015-05-04 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Read second time and amended. |
2015-04-29 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (April 29). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2015-04-23 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on AGRI. |
2015-04-22 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on AGRI. Read second time and amended. |
2015-03-16 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on AGRI. |
2015-02-27 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 29. |
2015-02-26 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |