CA AB95 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 13 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-09-10 - Ordered to inactive file at the request of Senator Leno.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 13 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-09-10 - Ordered to inactive file at the request of Senator Leno.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend the Budget Act of 2012 (Chapters 21 and 29 of the Statutes of 2012) by augmenting Item 9840-001-0001 of Section 2.00 of that act, relating to the state budget, and making an appropriation therefor, to take effect immediately, budget bill.
Title
Budget Act of 2012: augmentation.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-05-13 - Assembly - AB 95 BUDGET Assembly Third Reading By BLUMENFIELD (Y: 51 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-09-10 | Senate | Ordered to inactive file at the request of Senator Leno. |
2013-06-14 | Senate | Joint Rule 10.5 suspended. (Ayes 28. Noes 10. Page 1363.) |
2013-06-13 | Senate | Withdrawn from committee. (Ayes 23. Noes 9. Page 1337.) Ordered to third reading. |
2013-06-10 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2013-05-23 | Senate | Referred to Com. on RLS. |
2013-05-13 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2013-05-13 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 51. Noes 24. Page 1399.) |
2013-05-09 | Assembly | Withdrawn from committee. (Ayes 53. Noes 22. Page 1312.) Ordered to second reading. Assembly Rule 63 suspended. (Ayes 53. Noes 22. Page 1313.) Read second time. Ordered to third reading. (Ayes 53. Noes 22. Page 1314.) |
2013-03-14 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on BUDGET. |
2013-01-11 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee February 10. |
2013-01-10 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |