CA AB93 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-0)
Status: Passed on July 11 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-11 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 69, Statutes of 2013.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-0)
Status: Passed on July 11 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-11 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 69, Statutes of 2013.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 13073.5 of, to add Sections 7090, 7099.5, and 7119 to, and to repeal Chapter 12.8 (commencing with Section 7070), Chapter 12.93 (commencing with Section 7097), and Chapter 12.97 (commencing with Section 7105) of Division 7 of Title 1 of, the Government Code, to amend and repeal Sections 17053.33, 17053.34, 17053.45, 17053.46, 17053.47, 17053.70, 17053.74, 17053.75, 17235, 17267.2, 17267.6, 17268, 17276.2, 17276.5, 17276.6, 19136.8, 23612.2, 23622.7, 23622.8, 23633, 23634, 23645, 23646, 24356.6, 24356.7, 24356.8, 24384.5, 24416.2, 24416.5, and 24416.6 of, to add Section 18410.2 to, to add and repeal Sections 6377.1, 17053.73, 17059.2, 23626, and 23689 of, and to repeal, amend, and repeal Sections 17053.80 and 23623 of, the Revenue and Taxation Code, relating to economic development, making an appropriation therefor, and declaring the urgency thereof, to take effect immediately.
Title
Economic development: taxation: credits, deductions, exemptions, and net operating losses.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-06-27 - Assembly - AB 93 BUDGET Concurrence- Urgency Added By BLUMENFIELD (Y: 54 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2013-06-27 - Assembly - Senate amendments be concurred in (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2013-06-25 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB93 Committee on BUDGET (Blumenfield) By Wolk (Y: 30 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-06-24 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 9 N: 5 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-13 - Assembly - AB 93 BUDGET Assembly Third Reading By BLUMENFIELD (Y: 51 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2013-06-27 - Assembly - Senate amendments be concurred in (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2013-06-25 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB93 Committee on BUDGET (Blumenfield) By Wolk (Y: 30 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-06-24 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 9 N: 5 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-13 - Assembly - AB 93 BUDGET Assembly Third Reading By BLUMENFIELD (Y: 51 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-07-11 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 69, Statutes of 2013. | |
2013-07-11 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2013-07-03 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 2:55 p.m. |
2013-06-27 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV. pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.2. Joint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended. (Page 2188.) From committee: That the Senate amendments be concurred in. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 27). Assembly Rule 63 suspended. (Page 2204.) Urgency clause adopted. Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 54. Noes 16. Page 2210.). |
2013-06-26 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after June 28 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. Measure version as amended on June 25 corrected. |
2013-06-25 | Senate | Read third time and amended. Ordered to third reading. (Ayes 26. Noes 9. Page 1534.) Senate Rule 29.3 suspended. (Ayes 25. Noes 8. Page 1534.) Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 30. Noes 9. Page 1534.). |
2013-06-24 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on RLS. Withdrawn from committee. (Ayes 27. Noes 11. Page 1483.) Re-referred to Com. on B. & F.R. Joint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended. (Ayes 27. Noes 11. Page 1483.) From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 9. Noes 5.) (June 24). Bill ordered read a second time. (Ay |
2013-05-23 | Senate | Referred to Com. on RLS. |
2013-05-13 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2013-05-13 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 51. Noes 24. Page 1398.) |
2013-05-09 | Assembly | Withdrawn from committee. (Ayes 53. Noes 22. Page 1312.) Ordered to second reading. Assembly Rule 63 suspended. (Ayes 53. Noes 22. Page 1313.) Read second time. Ordered to third reading. (Ayes 53. Noes 22. Page 1314.) |
2013-03-14 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on BUDGET. |
2013-01-11 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee February 10. |
2013-01-10 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |