CA AB922 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 13 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-10-13 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 864, Statutes of 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Sections 125330, 125340, and 125341 of, to add Sections 125331 and 125356 to, and to repeal and add Section 125355 of, the Health and Safety Code, relating to reproductive health.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Reproductive health and research: oocyte procurement.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-09-12 - Assembly - AB 922 Burke Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 74 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-09-11 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB922 Burke By Portantino (Y: 28 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-12 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-20 - Assembly - Bill Votes (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-20 - Assembly - AB 922 Burke Assembly Third Reading (Y: 68 N: 0 NV: 12 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-09 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-10-13 Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 864, Statutes of 2019.
2019-10-13 Approved by the Governor.
2019-09-25AssemblyEnrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m.
2019-09-12AssemblySenate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 74. Noes 0. Page 3486.).
2019-09-11AssemblyIn Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending.
2019-09-11SenateRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 28. Noes 4. Page 2857.).
2019-09-09SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2019-09-06SenateRead third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
2019-06-13SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2019-06-12SenateFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 6. Noes 1.) (June 12).
2019-05-29SenateReferred to Com. on HEALTH.
2019-05-20SenateIn Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2019-05-20AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 68. Noes 0. Page 1720.)
2019-04-22AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2019-04-11AssemblyRead second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
2019-04-10AssemblyFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (April 9).
2019-03-04AssemblyReferred to Com. on HEALTH.
2019-02-21AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee March 23.
2019-02-20AssemblyRead first time. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Health and Safety Code125330Amended CodeCitation Text
Health and Safety Code125331New CodeSee Bill Text
Health and Safety Code125340Amended CodeCitation Text
Health and Safety Code125341Amended CodeCitation Text
Health and Safety Code125356New CodeSee Bill Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback