CA AB911 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on February 1 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-02-01 - From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on February 1 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-02-01 - From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Article 6 (commencing with Section 9140) to Chapter 2 of Division 8.5 of the Welfare and Institutions Code, relating to long-term services and supports.
Title
Long-Term Services and Supports (LTSS) Benefit Task Force.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-01 | Assembly | From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56. |
2022-01-31 | Assembly | Died pursuant to Art. IV, Sec. 10(c) of the Constitution. |
2021-04-20 | Assembly | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2021-04-15 | Assembly | (pending re-refer to Com. on HUM. S.) |
2021-04-15 | Assembly | Assembly Rule 56 suspended. (Page 1023.) |
2021-04-13 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on AGING & L.T.C. |
2021-04-12 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on AGING & L.T.C. Read second time and amended. |
2021-03-30 | Assembly | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2021-02-25 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on AGING & L.T.C. and HUM. S. |
2021-02-18 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 20. |
2021-02-17 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Welfare and Institutions Code | 9140 | New Code | See Bill Text |