CA AB890 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 21-2)
Status: Passed on September 29 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-09-29 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 265, Statutes of 2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Sections 650.01, 805, and 805.5 of, and to add Article 8.5 (commencing with Section 2837.100) to Chapter 6 of Division 2 of, the Business and Professions Code, relating to healing arts.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Nurse practitioners: scope of practice: practice without standardized procedures.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-08-31 - Assembly - AB 890 WOOD Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 53 N: 1 NV: 25 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-31 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB890 Wood et al. By Glazer (Y: 27 N: 3 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-20 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-19 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-08 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-27 - Assembly - AB 890 Wood Assembly Third Reading (Y: 61 N: 1 NV: 18 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-23 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-09 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-09-29 Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 265, Statutes of 2020.
2020-09-29 Approved by the Governor.
2020-09-14AssemblyEnrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
2020-08-31AssemblySenate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 53. Noes 1.).
2020-08-31AssemblyAssembly Rule 63 suspended.
2020-08-31AssemblyIn Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending.
2020-08-31SenateRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 27. Noes 3.).
2020-08-29SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2020-08-28SenateRead third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
2020-08-26SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2020-08-25SenateRead third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
2020-08-24SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2020-08-20SenateRead second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
2020-08-20SenateFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 4. Noes 2.) (August 20).
2020-08-19SenateIn committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file.
2020-08-13SenateRead second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2020-08-12SenateFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 1.) (August 8).
2020-08-06SenateFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D.
2020-07-23SenateFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D.
2020-06-23SenateReferred to Com. on B., P. & E.D.
2020-01-28SenateIn Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2020-01-27AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 61. Noes 1. Page 3900.)
2020-01-27AssemblyAssembly Rule 63 suspended. (Ayes 58. Noes 18. Page 3893.)
2020-01-27AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2020-01-23AssemblyRead second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
2020-01-23AssemblyFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (January 23).
2019-05-16AssemblyIn committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
2019-05-16AssemblyJoint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended. (Page 1760.)
2019-05-15AssemblyIn committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
2019-05-13AssemblyJoint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended. (Page 1609.)
2019-04-23AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on APPR.
2019-04-22AssemblyRead second time and amended.
2019-04-11AssemblyFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (April 9).
2019-04-04AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on B. & P.
2019-04-03AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on B. & P. Read second time and amended.
2019-03-04AssemblyReferred to Com. on B. & P.
2019-02-21AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee March 23.
2019-02-20AssemblyRead first time. To print.

Code Citations


California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback