CA AB871 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Failed on February 1 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-02-01 - From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Failed on February 1 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-02-01 - From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 8607.3 to the Government Code, relating to emergency services, and making an appropriation therefor.
Title
Office of Emergency Services: disaster programs.
Sponsors
Asm. Miguel Santiago [D] | Asm. Raul Bocanegra [D] | Asm. Eduardo Garcia [D] | Asm. Mike Gipson [D] |
Asm. Todd Gloria [D] |
Roll Calls
2017-04-19 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 15 N: 2 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-01 | Assembly | From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56. |
2018-01-31 | Assembly | Died pursuant to Art. IV, Sec. 10(c) of the Constitution. |
2017-05-26 | Assembly | In committee: Held under submission. |
2017-04-26 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2017-04-19 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 15. Noes 2.) (April 19). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2017-04-19 | Assembly | Coauthors revised. |
2017-04-17 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on G.O. |
2017-04-06 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on G.O. Read second time and amended. |
2017-03-22 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on G.O. |
2017-03-21 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on G.O. Read second time and amended. |
2017-03-20 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on G.O. |
2017-02-17 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 19. |
2017-02-16 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Government Code | 69921 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 8607.3 | New Code | See Bill Text |