CA AB87 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on January 15 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-09 - Re-referred to Com. on B. & F.R.
Pending: Senate Budget and Fiscal Review Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on January 15 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-09 - Re-referred to Com. on B. & F.R.
Pending: Senate Budget and Fiscal Review Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Sections 8654.2 and 16429.7 to the Government Code, to add Section 116773.5 to the Health and Safety Code, and to amend Sections 6902.5, 12209, 17039, 17039.3, 17052.10, 17276.23, 19900, 19902, 23036.3, and 24416.23 of, to add Sections 17158.2, 17158.3, 24308.2, and 24308.3 to, and to add and repeal Sections 17131.16, 17131.17, 24308.4, and 24308.5 of, the Revenue and Taxation Code, relating to economic relief, and making an appropriation therefor, to take effect immediately, bill related to the budget.
Title
Economic relief: COVID-19 pandemic.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-02-03 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-04-28 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 12 N: 5 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-15 - Assembly - AB 87 Ting Assembly Third Reading (Y: 48 N: 13 NV: 19 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-28 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 12 N: 5 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-15 - Assembly - AB 87 Ting Assembly Third Reading (Y: 48 N: 13 NV: 19 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-09 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on B. & F.R. |
2022-02-07 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2022-02-03 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (February 3). |
2022-02-02 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on B. & F.R. |
2021-05-18 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on B. & F.R. |
2021-04-29 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2021-04-28 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (April 28). |
2021-04-26 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on B. & F.R. |
2021-02-18 | Senate | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2021-02-16 | Senate | Joint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended. |
2021-01-25 | Senate | Referred to Com. on B. & F.R. |
2021-01-15 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2021-01-15 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 48. Noes 13. Page 164.) |
2021-01-12 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2021-01-11 | Assembly | (Ayes 46. Noes 13. Page 108.) |
2021-01-11 | Assembly | Ordered to second reading. |
2021-01-11 | Assembly | Without reference to committee. |
2020-12-08 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee January 7. |
2020-12-07 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |