CA AB861 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on October 11 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-01-14 - Consideration of Governor's veto stricken from file.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on October 11 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-01-14 - Consideration of Governor's veto stricken from file.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 100571 to the Health and Safety Code, relating to public health.
Title
Public health services: consolidated contracts.
Sponsors
Asm. Ira Ruskin [D] |
Roll Calls
2009-09-02 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB861 Ruskin By Yee (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-08-27 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-06-29 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-06-17 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-05-28 - Assembly - AB 861 RUSKIN Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-05-20 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-04-28 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and re-refer to Committee on Appropriations with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-04-13 - Assembly - Be referred to Committee on Health (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-08-27 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-06-29 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-06-17 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-05-28 - Assembly - AB 861 RUSKIN Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-05-20 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-04-28 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and re-refer to Committee on Appropriations with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-04-13 - Assembly - Be referred to Committee on Health (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-01-14 | Consideration of Governor's veto stricken from file. | |
2009-10-26 | Consideration of Governor's veto pending. | |
2009-10-11 | Vetoed by Governor. | |
2009-09-11 | Enrolled and to the Governor at 7 p.m. | |
2009-09-03 | In Assembly. To enrollment. | |
2009-09-02 | Read third time, passed, and to Assembly. (Ayes 35. Noes 0. Page 2110.) | |
2009-09-01 | Read second time. To third reading. | |
2009-08-31 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (August 27). (received by desk August 28, 2009 pursuant to JR61(a)(11)) | |
2009-06-29 | In committee: Placed on Appropriations suspense file. | |
2009-06-18 | From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Re-referred. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 17). | |
2009-06-11 | Referred to Com. on HEALTH. | |
2009-05-28 | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. | |
2009-05-28 | Read third time, passed, and to Senate. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 1767.) | |
2009-05-26 | Read second time. To Consent Calendar. | |
2009-05-21 | From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (May 20). | |
2009-05-06 | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2009-05-05 | Read second time and amended. | |
2009-05-04 | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 18. Noes 0.) (April 28). | |
2009-04-13 | From committee: Be re-referred to Com. on HEALTH. Re-referred. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (April 13). | |
2009-04-02 | Re-referred to Com. on RULES by unanimous consent. | |
2009-04-01 | Re-referred to Com. on HUM. S. | |
2009-03-31 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HUM. S. Read second time and amended. | |
2009-03-26 | Referred to Com. on HUM. S. | |
2009-02-27 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 29. | |
2009-02-26 | Read first time. To print. |