CA AB857 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 21-0)
Status: Passed on October 2 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-10-02 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 442, Statutes of 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 21-0)
Status: Passed on October 2 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-10-02 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 442, Statutes of 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 5130 and 7130 of the Corporations Code, to amend Sections 119, 1004, and 1100 of, and to add Section 1008 to, the Financial Code, to amend Sections 6254.26, 23007, 53601, 53635, and 53635.2 of, to add Division 5 (commencing with Section 57600) to Title 5 of, and to add Sections 6254.35, 54956.97, and 54956.98 to, the Government Code, and to add Section 23701aa to the Revenue and Taxation Code, relating to public banks.
Title
Public banks.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-09-13 - Assembly - AB 857 Chiu Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 42 N: 29 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-09-11 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB857 Chiu et al. By Hueso (Y: 25 N: 11 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-08-30 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-08-12 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-07-03 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-19 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Governance and Finance] (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-30 - Assembly - AB 857 Chiu Assembly Third Reading (Y: 41 N: 29 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-16 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 11 N: 5 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-24 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-22 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Local Government] (Y: 7 N: 3 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-09-11 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB857 Chiu et al. By Hueso (Y: 25 N: 11 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-08-30 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-08-12 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-07-03 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-19 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Governance and Finance] (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-30 - Assembly - AB 857 Chiu Assembly Third Reading (Y: 41 N: 29 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-16 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 11 N: 5 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-24 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-22 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Local Government] (Y: 7 N: 3 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-10-02 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 442, Statutes of 2019. | |
2019-10-02 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2019-09-26 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m. |
2019-09-13 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 42. Noes 29. Page 3538.). |
2019-09-11 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. |
2019-09-11 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 25. Noes 11. Page 2807.). |
2019-09-09 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2019-09-06 | Senate | Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2019-09-03 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2019-08-30 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading. |
2019-08-30 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (August 30). |
2019-08-12 | Senate | In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2019-07-09 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2019-07-08 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 3.) (July 3). |
2019-06-20 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F. |
2019-06-19 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on GOV. & F. (Ayes 4. Noes 2.) (June 19). |
2019-06-12 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on B. & F.I. and GOV. & F. |
2019-05-30 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2019-05-30 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 41. Noes 29. Page 2158.) |
2019-05-20 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2019-05-17 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading. |
2019-05-16 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 11. Noes 5.) (May 16). |
2019-05-08 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2019-04-30 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2019-04-29 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. |
2019-04-25 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (April 24). |
2019-04-23 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on L. GOV. (Ayes 7. Noes 3.) (April 22). Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV. |
2019-04-11 | Assembly | (pending re-referral to Com. on L. GOV.) |
2019-04-11 | Assembly | Assembly Rule 56 suspended. (Page 1150.) |
2019-03-20 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on B. & F. |
2019-03-19 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on B. & F. Read second time and amended. |
2019-03-18 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on B. & F. and L. GOV. |
2019-02-21 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 23. |
2019-02-20 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Corporations Code | 5130 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Corporations Code | 7130 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Financial Code | 1004 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Financial Code | 1008 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Financial Code | 1100 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Financial Code | 119 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 23007 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 53601 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 53635 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 53635.2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 57600 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Government Code | 6254.26 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Revenue and Taxation Code | 23701 | New Code | See Bill Text |