CA AB857 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on October 12 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-06 - Last day to consider Governor's veto pursuant to Joint Rule 58.5.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on October 12 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-06 - Last day to consider Governor's veto pursuant to Joint Rule 58.5.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 101, 9008, 9030, and 9031 of, and to add Sections 9009.5, 9009.6, 9022.5, 9036, and 9037 to, the Elections Code, relating to elections.
Title
Initiatives: petition circulators.
Sponsors
Asm. Paul Fong [D] |
Roll Calls
2013-09-11 - Assembly - AB 857 FONG Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 51 N: 25 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2013-09-10 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB857 Fong By Torres (Y: 23 N: 11 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-08-30 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-08-19 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-07-02 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-29 - Assembly - AB 857 FONG Assembly Third Reading (Y: 53 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2013-05-24 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 12 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-23 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-09-10 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB857 Fong By Torres (Y: 23 N: 11 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-08-30 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-08-19 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-07-02 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-29 - Assembly - AB 857 FONG Assembly Third Reading (Y: 53 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2013-05-24 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 12 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-23 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-06 | Last day to consider Governor's veto pursuant to Joint Rule 58.5. | |
2014-01-06 | Consideration of Governor's veto pending. | |
2013-10-12 | Vetoed by Governor. | |
2013-09-26 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4:30 p.m. |
2013-09-11 | Assembly | Assembly Rule 77 suspended. (Page 3195.) Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 51. Noes 25. Page 3213.). |
2013-09-10 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 12 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. |
2013-09-10 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 23. Noes 11. Page 2309.). |
2013-09-09 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2013-09-06 | Senate | Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2013-09-03 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2013-08-30 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (August 30). |
2013-08-19 | Senate | In committee: Placed on APPR. suspense file. |
2013-08-12 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2013-08-08 | Senate | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2013-07-03 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 1.) (July 2). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2013-06-26 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on E. & C.A. |
2013-06-13 | Senate | Referred to Com. on E. & C.A. |
2013-05-29 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2013-05-29 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 53. Noes 24. Page 1755.) |
2013-05-28 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2013-05-24 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (May 24). Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2013-05-08 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2013-04-24 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (April 23). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2013-04-17 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on E. & R. |
2013-04-16 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on E. & R. Read second time and amended. |
2013-04-01 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on E. & R. |
2013-03-21 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on E. & R. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on E. & R. Read second time and amended. |
2013-02-22 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 24. |
2013-02-21 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Elections Code | 101 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
Elections Code | 18601 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Elections Code | 18602 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Elections Code | 9001 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Elections Code | 9008 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Elections Code | 9009.5 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Elections Code | 9009.6 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Elections Code | 9012 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Elections Code | 9021 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Elections Code | 9022 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Elections Code | 9022.5 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Elections Code | 9030 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Elections Code | 9031 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Elections Code | 9036 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Elections Code | 9037 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Elections Code | 9038 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Elections Code | 9039 | New Code | See Bill Text |