CA AB848 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 10 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-10-10 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 744, Statutes of 2015.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 10 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-10-10 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 744, Statutes of 2015.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 11834.03 and 11834.36 of, and to add Sections 11834.025 and 11834.026 to, the Health and Safety Code, relating to alcohol and drug treatment programs.
Title
Alcoholism and drug abuse treatment facilities.
Sponsors
Asm. Mark Stone [D] |
Roll Calls
2015-09-03 - Assembly - AB 848 STONE Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 72 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2015-09-01 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB848 Mark Stone By Hernandez (Y: 29 N: 9 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-08-27 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-08-17 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-07-15 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-03 - Assembly - AB 848 STONE Assembly Third Reading (Y: 74 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2015-05-28 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2015-04-28 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-14 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Health (Y: 12 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-09-01 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB848 Mark Stone By Hernandez (Y: 29 N: 9 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-08-27 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-08-17 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-07-15 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-03 - Assembly - AB 848 STONE Assembly Third Reading (Y: 74 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2015-05-28 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2015-04-28 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-14 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Health (Y: 12 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-10-10 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 744, Statutes of 2015. | |
2015-10-10 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2015-09-16 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m. |
2015-09-03 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 72. Noes 4. Page 2837.). |
2015-09-01 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 3 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. |
2015-09-01 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 29. Noes 9. Page 2353.). |
2015-08-31 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading. |
2015-08-27 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 6. Noes 1.) (August 27). |
2015-08-17 | Senate | In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2015-07-16 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 1.) (July 15). Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2015-07-02 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2015-06-30 | Senate | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2015-06-18 | Senate | Referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2015-06-03 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2015-06-03 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 74. Noes 3. Page 1871.) |
2015-06-02 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2015-06-01 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading. |
2015-05-28 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (May 28). |
2015-05-20 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2015-05-07 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2015-05-06 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Read second time and amended. |
2015-04-29 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 19. Noes 0.) (April 28). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2015-04-14 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on HEALTH. (Ayes 12. Noes 2.) (April 14). Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2015-04-07 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on B. & P. |
2015-04-06 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on B. & P. Read second time and amended. |
2015-03-16 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on B. & P. |
2015-02-27 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 29. |
2015-02-26 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Health and Safety Code | 11834.025 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Health and Safety Code | 11834.026 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Health and Safety Code | 11834.03 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Health and Safety Code | 11834.05 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
Health and Safety Code | 11834.36 | Amended Code | Citation Text |