CA AB841 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 16 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-16 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 98, Statutes of 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 16 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-16 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 98, Statutes of 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 300 of the Welfare and Institutions Code, relating to juveniles.
Title
Dependant children.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-06-28 - Assembly - AB 841 Cunningham Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-17 - Senate - Consent Calendar AB841 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-08 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and be ordered to the Consent Calendar (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-19 - Assembly - AB 841 Cunningham Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-13 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-07 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-17 - Senate - Consent Calendar AB841 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-08 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and be ordered to the Consent Calendar (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-19 - Assembly - AB 841 Cunningham Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-13 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-07 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-07-16 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 98, Statutes of 2021. | |
2021-07-16 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2021-07-05 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4:30 p.m. | |
2021-06-28 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 2132.). |
2021-06-17 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after June 19 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. |
2021-06-17 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 1544.). |
2021-06-09 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered to consent calendar. |
2021-06-08 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (June 8). |
2021-05-12 | Senate | Referred to Com. on JUD. |
2021-04-19 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2021-04-19 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 1071.) |
2021-04-14 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2021-04-13 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (April 13). |
2021-04-08 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (April 7). Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2021-03-24 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on HUM. S. |
2021-03-23 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HUM. S. Read second time and amended. |
2021-02-25 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on HUM. S. and JUD. |
2021-02-18 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 20. |
2021-02-17 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Welfare and Institutions Code | 300 | Amended Code | Citation Text |