CA AB840 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on September 30 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-09-30 - Vetoed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on September 30 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-09-30 - Vetoed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 19851.2 to, and to add and repeal Section 19851.3 of, the Government Code, relating to state employees.
Title
Nurses and certified nursing assistants: overtime.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-08-25 - Assembly - AB 840 RIDLEY-THOMAS Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 57 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-08-22 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB840 Ridley-Thomas By Pan (Y: 26 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-08-11 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-08-01 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-27 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-02 - Assembly - AB 840 RIDLEY-THOMAS Assembly Third Reading (Y: 57 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-05-28 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 12 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-22 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-08-22 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB840 Ridley-Thomas By Pan (Y: 26 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-08-11 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-08-01 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-27 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-02 - Assembly - AB 840 RIDLEY-THOMAS Assembly Third Reading (Y: 57 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-05-28 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 12 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-22 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-09-30 | Vetoed by Governor. | |
2016-09-01 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4:30 p.m. |
2016-08-25 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 57. Noes 21. Page 6303.). |
2016-08-23 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 25 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. |
2016-08-22 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 26. Noes 13. Page 5255.). |
2016-08-19 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2016-08-18 | Senate | Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2016-08-15 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2016-08-11 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (August 11). |
2016-08-01 | Senate | In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2016-06-27 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 3. Noes 0.) (June 27). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2015-06-11 | Senate | Referred to Com. on P.E. & R. |
2015-06-02 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2015-06-02 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 57. Noes 21. Page 1782.) |
2015-06-01 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2015-05-28 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (May 28). |
2015-04-29 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2015-04-22 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 1.) (April 22). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2015-03-16 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on P.E., R., & S.S. |
2015-02-27 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 29. |
2015-02-26 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Government Code | 19851.2 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Government Code | 19851.3 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |