CA AB838 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on September 28 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-09-28 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 351, Statutes of 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on September 28 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-09-28 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 351, Statutes of 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 17970.5 to the Health and Safety Code, relating to building standards.
Title
State Housing Law: enforcement response to complaints.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-09-02 - Assembly - AB 838 Friedman Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 51 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2021-09-01 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB838 Friedman et al. By Durazo (Y: 26 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-08-26 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-08-16 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-07-08 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-07-01 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Rules] (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-10 - Assembly - AB 838 Friedman Assembly Third Reading (Y: 45 N: 18 NV: 15 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-28 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 12 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-15 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-09-01 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB838 Friedman et al. By Durazo (Y: 26 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-08-26 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-08-16 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-07-08 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-07-01 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Rules] (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-10 - Assembly - AB 838 Friedman Assembly Third Reading (Y: 45 N: 18 NV: 15 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-28 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 12 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-15 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-09-28 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 351, Statutes of 2021. | |
2021-09-28 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2021-09-10 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m. | |
2021-09-02 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 51. Noes 20. Page 2738.). |
2021-09-02 | Assembly | Assembly Rule 77 suspended. (Ayes 57. Noes 14. Page 2703.) |
2021-09-01 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 3 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. |
2021-09-01 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 26. Noes 10. Page 2296.). |
2021-08-26 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2021-08-26 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (August 26). |
2021-08-16 | Senate | In committee: Referred to suspense file. |
2021-07-13 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2021-07-12 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 0.) (July 8). |
2021-07-07 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F. |
2021-07-01 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on RLS. (Ayes 6. Noes 1.) (July 1). Re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2021-06-23 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on HOUSING. |
2021-06-11 | Senate | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2021-05-19 | Senate | Referred to Com. on HOUSING. |
2021-05-11 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2021-05-10 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 45. Noes 18. Page 1357.) |
2021-04-29 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2021-04-28 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 4.) (April 28). |
2021-04-19 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 2.) (April 15). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2021-04-06 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on H. & C.D. |
2021-04-05 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on H. & C.D. Read second time and amended. |
2021-02-25 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on H. & C.D. |
2021-02-18 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 20. |
2021-02-17 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Health and Safety Code | 17970.5 | New Code | See Bill Text |