CA AB836 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on February 1 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-02-01 - From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on February 1 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-02-01 - From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Chapter 18 (commencing with Section 9400) to Division 3 of the Business and Professions Code, relating to tour guides.
Title
Tour guides: regulation.
Sponsors
Asm. Anthony Rendon [D] | Asm. Evan Low [D] |
Roll Calls
2015-04-28 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-14 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Arts, Entertain, Sports, Tourism, & Internet Media (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-04-14 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Arts, Entertain, Sports, Tourism, & Internet Media (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-02-01 | Assembly | From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56. |
2016-01-31 | Assembly | Died pursuant to Article IV, Sec. 10(c) of the Constitution. |
2015-05-28 | Assembly | In committee: Held under submission. |
2015-05-20 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2015-05-06 | Assembly | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2015-04-28 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (April 28). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2015-04-16 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on A.,E.,S.,T., & I.M. |
2015-04-15 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. |
2015-04-14 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on A.,E.,S.,T., & I.M. (Ayes 12. Noes 1.) (April 14). |
2015-04-07 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on B. & P. |
2015-04-06 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on B. & P. Read second time and amended. |
2015-03-12 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on B. & P. and A.,E.,S.,T., & I.M. |
2015-02-27 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 29. |
2015-02-26 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Business and Professions Code | 9400 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |