CA AB833 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-10-03 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 495, Statutes of 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-10-03 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 495, Statutes of 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 40220 and 40220.5 of the Vehicle Code, relating to vehicles, and declaring the urgency thereof, to take effect immediately.
Title
Parking penalties.
Sponsors
Asm. Tom Lackey [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-09-12 - Assembly - AB 833 Lackey Concurrence - Urgency Added (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-09-11 - Assembly - With recommendation: That Senate amendments be concurred in (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-08-26 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB833 Lackey By Galgiani Urgency Clause (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-07-09 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-22 - Assembly - AB 833 Lackey Assembly Third Reading (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-09 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-09-11 - Assembly - With recommendation: That Senate amendments be concurred in (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-08-26 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB833 Lackey By Galgiani Urgency Clause (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-07-09 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-22 - Assembly - AB 833 Lackey Assembly Third Reading (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-09 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-10-03 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 495, Statutes of 2019. | |
2019-10-03 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2019-09-24 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m. |
2019-09-12 | Assembly | Urgency clause adopted. Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 3476.). |
2019-09-11 | Assembly | From committee: That the Senate amendments be concurred in. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (September 11). |
2019-09-10 | Assembly | Joint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended. (Page 3303.) |
2019-08-30 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on TRANS. pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.2. |
2019-08-27 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 29 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. |
2019-08-26 | Senate | Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 2283.). |
2019-08-21 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2019-08-20 | Senate | Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2019-08-13 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2019-08-12 | Senate | From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8. |
2019-07-09 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (July 9). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2019-07-03 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on TRANS. |
2019-06-26 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2019-06-26 | Senate | Withdrawn from committee. |
2019-06-25 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D. |
2019-06-04 | Senate | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2019-05-01 | Senate | Referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D. |
2019-04-23 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2019-04-22 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 1256.) |
2019-04-10 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2019-04-09 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 20. Noes 0.) (April 9). |
2019-03-21 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on B. & P. |
2019-02-21 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 23. |
2019-02-20 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Vehicle Code | 40220 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Vehicle Code | 40220.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |