CA AB820 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 6 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-08-06 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 126, Statutes of 2009.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 6 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-08-06 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 126, Statutes of 2009.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 19889.7 and 22959.6 of the Government Code, relating to public employees, and making an appropriation therefor.
Title
Public employees.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2009-07-09 - Senate - Special Consent #12 AB820 Conway (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2009-06-29 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2009-06-08 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations Recommend Consent (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2009-05-14 - Assembly - AB 820 CONWAY Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 73 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [FAIL]
2009-05-06 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2009-04-22 - Assembly - Do pass and re-refer to Committee on Appropriations with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2009-06-29 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2009-06-08 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations Recommend Consent (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2009-05-14 - Assembly - AB 820 CONWAY Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 73 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [FAIL]
2009-05-06 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2009-04-22 - Assembly - Do pass and re-refer to Committee on Appropriations with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-08-06 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 126, Statutes of 2009. | |
2009-08-05 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2009-07-30 | Enrolled and to the Governor at 2:30 p.m. | |
2009-07-09 | In Assembly. To enrollment. | |
2009-07-09 | Read third time, passed, and to Assembly. (Ayes 34. Noes 0. Page 1668.) | |
2009-07-02 | Ordered to Special Consent Calendar. | |
2009-07-01 | Read second time. To third reading. | |
2009-06-30 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (June 29). | |
2009-06-08 | From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on APPR with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. Re-referred. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 8). | |
2009-05-21 | Referred to Com. on P.E. & R. | |
2009-05-14 | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. | |
2009-05-14 | Read third time, passed, and to Senate. (Ayes 73. Noes 0. Page 1469.) | |
2009-05-11 | Read second time. To Consent Calendar. | |
2009-05-07 | From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (May 6). | |
2009-04-22 | From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. Re-referred. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (April 22). | |
2009-03-23 | Referred to Com. on P.E.,R. & S.S. | |
2009-03-01 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 30. | |
2009-02-26 | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Government Code | 19889.7 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 22959.6 | Amended Code | Citation Text |