CA AB819 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-2)
Status: Passed on September 27 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-09-27 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 351, Statutes of 2010.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-2)
Status: Passed on September 27 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-09-27 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 351, Statutes of 2010.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 350, 653h, 653s, 653u, 653w, 653z, 653aa, and 1202.4 of, and to add Chapter 5.8 (commencing with Section 13849) to Title 6 of Part 4 of, the Penal Code, relating to intellectual property piracy, and declaring the urgency thereof, to take effect immediately.
Title
Intellectual property piracy.
Sponsors
Asm. Robert Blumenfield [D] | Asm. Charles Calderon [D] | Asm. Dave Jones [D] | Sen. Ted Lieu [D] |
Sen. Anthony Portantino [D] | Asm. Cameron Smyth [R] | Asm. Van Tran [R] |
Roll Calls
2010-08-19 - Assembly - AB 819 CALDERON Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2010-08-18 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB819 Charles Calderon Urgency Clause (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2010-06-29 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-06-02 - Assembly - AB 819 CALDERON Third Reading Urgency (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-05-28 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 12 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-04-28 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-08-18 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB819 Charles Calderon Urgency Clause (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2010-06-29 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-06-02 - Assembly - AB 819 CALDERON Third Reading Urgency (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-05-28 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 12 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-04-28 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-09-27 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 351, Statutes of 2010. | |
2010-09-25 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2010-08-26 | Enrolled and to the Governor at 4:45 p.m. | |
2010-08-19 | Assembly Rule 77 suspended. (Page 6373.) Senate amendments concurred in. To enrollment. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 6377.) | |
2010-08-18 | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 20 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. | |
2010-08-18 | Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed and to Assembly. (Ayes 34. Noes 0. Page 4581.) | |
2010-08-16 | Read second time. To third reading. | |
2010-08-12 | Read third time, amended. To second reading. | |
2010-08-03 | Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading. | |
2010-08-02 | From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and be amended. | |
2010-07-15 | From committee: Amend, do pass as amended, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 29). Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2010-06-22 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. | |
2009-07-14 | In committee: Set, second hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | |
2009-07-09 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. | |
2009-07-07 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | |
2009-06-18 | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. | |
2009-06-03 | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. | |
2009-06-02 | Read second time. To third reading. Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed and to Senate. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 1960.) | |
2009-06-01 | Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading. | |
2009-05-29 | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (May 28). | |
2009-05-20 | In committee: Set, second hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. | |
2009-05-13 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | |
2009-05-07 | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2009-05-06 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Read second time and amended. | |
2009-04-28 | From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Re-referred. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 28). | |
2009-04-21 | In committee: Set, second hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | |
2009-04-16 | Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. | |
2009-04-15 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. Read second time and amended. | |
2009-04-14 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | |
2009-03-23 | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. | |
2009-03-01 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 30. | |
2009-02-26 | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Penal Code | 1202.4 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Penal Code | 13849 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Penal Code | 350 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Penal Code | 653 | Amended Code | Citation Text |