CA AB814 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 1 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-08-26 - In committee: Held under submission.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 1 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-08-26 - In committee: Held under submission.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Title 1.81.9 (commencing with Section 1798.600) to Part 4 of Division 3 of the Civil Code, relating to personal information.
Title
Personal information: contact tracing.
Sponsors
Asm. Marc Levine [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-08-16 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-07-06 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-01 - Assembly - AB 814 Levine Assembly Third Reading (Y: 60 N: 13 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-20 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 12 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-20 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 8 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-08 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary] (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-07-06 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-01 - Assembly - AB 814 Levine Assembly Third Reading (Y: 60 N: 13 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-20 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 12 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-20 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 8 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-08 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary] (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-08-26 | Senate | In committee: Held under submission. |
2021-08-16 | Senate | In committee: Referred to suspense file. |
2021-07-08 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2021-07-07 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 2.) (July 6). |
2021-06-16 | Senate | Referred to Com. on JUD. |
2021-06-02 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2021-06-01 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 60. Noes 13. Page 1769.) |
2021-05-25 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2021-05-24 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading. |
2021-05-20 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 12. Noes 4.) (May 20). |
2021-05-05 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2021-04-22 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2021-04-21 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. |
2021-04-20 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 2.) (April 20). |
2021-04-08 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 10. Noes 1.) (April 8). Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2021-02-25 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on P. & C.P. and JUD. |
2021-02-17 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 19. |
2021-02-16 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Civil Code | 1798.600 | New Code | See Bill Text |