CA AB797 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-6)
Status: Passed on September 24 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-09-24 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 554, Statutes of 2016.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-6)
Status: Passed on September 24 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-09-24 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 554, Statutes of 2016.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 43.100 to the Civil Code, and to amend Section 597.7 of the Penal Code, relating to trespass.
Title
Motor vehicles: rescue or provision of care for animal: civil and criminal liability.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-08-25 - Assembly - AB 797 STEINORTH Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2016-08-23 - Assembly - Senate amendments be concurred in (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-08-15 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB797 Steinorth By Glazer (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-28 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-14 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Rules (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-30 - Assembly - AB 797 STEINORTH Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2015-04-22 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-15 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-08-23 - Assembly - Senate amendments be concurred in (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-08-15 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB797 Steinorth By Glazer (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-28 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-14 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Rules (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-30 - Assembly - AB 797 STEINORTH Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2015-04-22 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-15 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-09-24 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 554, Statutes of 2016. | |
2016-09-24 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2016-09-01 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4:30 p.m. |
2016-08-25 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 6282.). |
2016-08-24 | Assembly | From committee: That the Senate amendments be concurred in. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (August 23). |
2016-08-18 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on JUD. pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.2. |
2016-08-16 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 18 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. |
2016-08-15 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 4969.). |
2016-08-02 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2016-08-01 | Senate | Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2016-06-30 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2016-06-29 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 28). |
2016-06-15 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on RLS. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 14). Re-referred to Com. on RLS. Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2016-06-06 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2016-05-23 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2016-01-28 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2015-08-31 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2015-08-18 | Senate | Withdrawn from committee. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2015-08-17 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on G.O. |
2015-06-19 | Senate | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2015-06-08 | Senate | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2015-05-14 | Senate | Referred to Com. on G.O. |
2015-04-30 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2015-04-30 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 1225.) |
2015-04-23 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2015-04-22 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (April 22). |
2015-04-15 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (April 15). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2015-04-07 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on A. & A.R. |
2015-04-06 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on A. & A.R. Read second time and amended. |
2015-03-12 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on A. & A.R. |
2015-02-27 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 29. |
2015-02-26 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Civil Code | 43.100 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Government Code | 11343.4 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 11349.3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Penal Code | 597.7 | Amended Code | Citation Text |