CA AB78 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on December 15 2022 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-03-22 - In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
Pending: Assembly Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Section 210 of the Code of Civil Procedure, and to amend Sections 890, 896, 900, 901, 903.3, and 905.5 of, and to add Section 913.5 to, the Penal Code, relating to grand juries.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Grand juries.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2023-02-28 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2023-03-22AssemblyIn committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
2023-02-28AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 2.) (February 28). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2023-02-02AssemblyReferred to Com. on PUB. S.
2023-01-04AssemblyRead first time.
2022-12-16AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee January 15.
2022-12-15AssemblyIntroduced. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Code of Civil Procedure210Amended CodeCitation Text
Penal Code890Amended CodeCitation Text
Penal Code896Amended CodeCitation Text
Penal Code900Amended CodeCitation Text
Penal Code901Amended CodeCitation Text
Penal Code903.3Amended CodeCitation Text
Penal Code905.5Amended CodeCitation Text
Penal Code913.5New CodeSee Bill Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback