CA AB78 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 27 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2021-08-26 - In committee: Held under submission.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Sections 32601, 32602, 32603, and 32604 of the Public Resources Code, relating to the San Gabriel and Lower Los Angeles Rivers and Mountains Conservancy.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

San Gabriel and Lower Los Angeles Rivers and Mountains Conservancy: territory: Dominguez Channel watershed and Santa Catalina Island.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-08-23 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-29 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-27 - Assembly - AB 78 O'Donnell Assembly Third Reading (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-20 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-14 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-08-26SenateIn committee: Held under submission.
2021-08-23SenateIn committee: Referred to suspense file.
2021-06-29SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 0. Page 1719.) (June 29). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2021-06-09SenateReferred to Com. on N.R. & W.
2021-05-28SenateIn Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2021-05-27AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 78. Noes 0.)
2021-05-24AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2021-05-20AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (May 20).
2021-04-28AssemblyIn committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
2021-04-14AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (April 14). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2021-01-11AssemblyReferred to Com. on NAT. RES.
2020-12-08AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee January 7.
2020-12-07AssemblyRead first time. To print.

Code Citations


California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback