CA AB776 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 6 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-10-06 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 519, Statutes of 2015.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 6 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-10-06 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 519, Statutes of 2015.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 25500 and 25666 of, and to add Sections 23355.3, 23399.65, and 23402.5 to, the Business and Professions Code, relating to alcoholic beverages.
Title
Alcoholic beverage control.
Sponsors
Asm. Jim Cooper [D] |
Roll Calls
2015-09-11 - Assembly - AB 776 COOPER Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2015-09-11 - Assembly - Senate amendments be concurred in (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-09-10 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB776 Cooper By Hall (Y: 39 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-07-14 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-26 - Assembly - AB 776 COOPER Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2015-05-20 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-04-27 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-09-11 - Assembly - Senate amendments be concurred in (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-09-10 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB776 Cooper By Hall (Y: 39 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-07-14 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-26 - Assembly - AB 776 COOPER Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2015-05-20 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-04-27 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-10-06 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 519, Statutes of 2015. | |
2015-10-06 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2015-09-23 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m. |
2015-09-11 | Assembly | From committee: That the Senate amendments be concurred in. (Ayes 19. Noes 0.) (September 11). Assembly Rule 63 suspended. (Page 3156.) Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 3164.). |
2015-09-11 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on G.O. pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.2. Joint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended. (Page 3133.) |
2015-09-10 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. |
2015-09-10 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 1. Page 2712.). |
2015-09-08 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2015-09-04 | Senate | Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2015-08-18 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2015-08-17 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR. From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8. |
2015-07-14 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (July 14). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2015-06-04 | Senate | Referred to Com. on G.O. |
2015-05-26 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2015-05-26 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 1594.) |
2015-05-21 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2015-05-20 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (May 20). |
2015-04-28 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 20. Noes 0.) (April 27). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2015-04-16 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on G.O. |
2015-04-15 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on G.O. Read second time and amended. |
2015-04-08 | Assembly | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2015-03-12 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on G.O. |
2015-02-26 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 28. |
2015-02-25 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Business and Professions Code | 23355.3 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Business and Professions Code | 23399.65 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Business and Professions Code | 23402.5 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Business and Professions Code | 25350 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Business and Professions Code | 25500 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Business and Professions Code | 25666 | Amended Code | Citation Text |