CA AB759 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on October 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-10-08 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 617, Statutes of 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on October 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-10-08 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 617, Statutes of 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add and repeal Section 92.1 of the Streets and Highways Code, relating to traffic safety.
Title
Traffic safety: work zones: positive protection measures.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-09-12 - Assembly - AB 759 Bigelow Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-09-11 - Assembly - With recommendation: That Senate amendments be concurred in (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-09-09 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB759 Bigelow et al. By Umberg (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-08-30 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-08-12 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-07-09 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-11 - Senate - Do pass and be ordered to the Consent Calendar (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-02 - Assembly - AB 759 Bigelow Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-24 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-09-11 - Assembly - With recommendation: That Senate amendments be concurred in (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-09-09 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB759 Bigelow et al. By Umberg (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-08-30 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-08-12 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-07-09 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-11 - Senate - Do pass and be ordered to the Consent Calendar (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-02 - Assembly - AB 759 Bigelow Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-24 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-10-08 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 617, Statutes of 2019. | |
2019-10-08 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2019-09-24 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m. |
2019-09-12 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 3475.). |
2019-09-11 | Assembly | From committee: That the Senate amendments be concurred in. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (September 11). |
2019-09-10 | Assembly | Joint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended. (Page 3303.) |
2019-09-10 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on TRANS. pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.2. |
2019-09-10 | Assembly | Assembly Rule 77 suspended. (Page 3252.) |
2019-09-09 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 11 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. |
2019-09-09 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 2703.). |
2019-09-05 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2019-09-04 | Senate | Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2019-08-30 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2019-08-30 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (August 30). |
2019-08-12 | Senate | In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2019-07-11 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2019-07-11 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (July 9). |
2019-07-03 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on TRANS. |
2019-07-01 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10(c). |
2019-07-01 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2019-06-27 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading. |
2019-06-27 | Senate | Ordered to second reading. |
2019-06-27 | Senate | From inactive file. |
2019-06-13 | Senate | Ordered to inactive file at the request of Senator Jones. |
2019-06-13 | Senate | From Consent Calendar. |
2019-06-12 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2019-06-11 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (June 11). |
2019-05-16 | Senate | Referred to Com. on G.O. |
2019-05-02 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2019-05-02 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 1480.) |
2019-04-29 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2019-04-25 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 19. Noes 0.) (April 24). |
2019-02-28 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on G.O. |
2019-02-20 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 22. |
2019-02-19 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Streets and Highways Code | 92.1 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |