CA AB746 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 19 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-04-12 - From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HEALTH. Read second time and amended.
Pending: Assembly Health Committee
Hearing: Apr 23 @ 1:30 pm in State Capitol, Room 4202
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Section 110480 of the Health and Safety Code, relating to beer manufacturers.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Sherman Food, Drug, and Cosmetic Law: beer manufacturer licensees: exemption.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-12AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HEALTH. Read second time and amended.
2019-02-28AssemblyReferred to Com. on HEALTH.
2019-02-20AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee March 22.
2019-02-19AssemblyRead first time. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Health and Safety Code110480Amended CodeCitation Text
Health and Safety Code113947.1Amended CodeCitation Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback