CA AB733 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on October 11 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-10-11 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 657, Statutes of 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on October 11 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-10-11 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 657, Statutes of 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 53398.50 and 53398.52 of the Government Code, relating to local government.
Title
Enhanced infrastructure financing districts: projects: climate change.
Sponsors
Asm. Marc Berman [D] | Sen. Henry Stern [D] |
Roll Calls
2017-09-07 - Assembly - AB 733 BERMAN Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 58 N: 20 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-09-05 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB733 Berman et al. By Stern (Y: 27 N: 11 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-21 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-07 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Environmental Quality] (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-04 - Assembly - AB 733 BERMAN Assembly Third Reading (Y: 56 N: 17 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-05 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-09-05 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB733 Berman et al. By Stern (Y: 27 N: 11 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-21 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-07 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Environmental Quality] (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-04 - Assembly - AB 733 BERMAN Assembly Third Reading (Y: 56 N: 17 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-05 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-10-11 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 657, Statutes of 2017. | |
2017-10-11 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2017-09-13 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m. |
2017-09-07 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 58. Noes 20. Page 3019.). |
2017-09-05 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 7 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. |
2017-09-05 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 27. Noes 11. Page 2471.). |
2017-06-26 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading. |
2017-06-22 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 1.) (June 21). |
2017-06-07 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on EQ. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (June 7). Re-referred to Com. on EQ. |
2017-05-18 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on GOV. & F. and EQ. |
2017-05-04 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2017-05-04 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 56. Noes 17. Page 1375.) |
2017-04-17 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2017-04-06 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 3.) (April 5). |
2017-03-27 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV. |
2017-03-23 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on L. GOV. Read second time and amended. |
2017-03-02 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on L. GOV. |
2017-02-16 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 18. |
2017-02-15 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Government Code | 53398.50 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 53398.52 | Amended Code | Citation Text |