CA AB710 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Engrossed on May 28 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-06-14 - In committee: Set, second hearing. Failed passage.
Pending: Senate Business, Professions and Economic Development Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 28 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-06-14 - In committee: Set, second hearing. Failed passage.
Pending: Senate Business, Professions and Economic Development Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Chapter 8 (commencing with Section 58597) to Part 1 of Division 21 of the Food and Agricultural Code, relating to agricultural products.
Title
Sale of listed agricultural products: requirements for sale.
Sponsors
Asm. Eduardo Garcia [D] | Asm. Chad Mayes [I] | Asm. Robert Rivas [D] | Sen. Melissa Hurtado [D] |
Asm. Lorena Gonzalez Fletcher [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-06-13 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Agriculture] (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-05-28 - Assembly - AB 710 Eduardo Garcia Assembly Third Reading (Y: 50 N: 16 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-20 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 12 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-15 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-28 - Assembly - AB 710 Eduardo Garcia Assembly Third Reading (Y: 50 N: 16 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-20 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 12 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-15 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-14 | Senate | In committee: Set, second hearing. Failed passage. |
2022-06-02 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D. |
2021-06-30 | Senate | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2021-06-24 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D. |
2021-06-09 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on B., P. & E.D. and AGRI. |
2021-05-28 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2021-05-28 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 50. Noes 16. Page 1688.) |
2021-05-24 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2021-05-20 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 4.) (May 20). |
2021-05-20 | Assembly | Coauthors revised. |
2021-05-05 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2021-04-15 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 1.) (April 15). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2021-03-22 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on AGRI. |
2021-03-18 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on AGRI. Read second time and amended. |
2021-02-25 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on AGRI. |
2021-02-17 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 19. |
2021-02-16 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Food and Agricultural Code | 58597 | New Code | See Bill Text |