CA AB701 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 26 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-02-02 - From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 26 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-02-02 - From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend and repeal Section 20112 of, and to add Section 20112.1 to, the Public Contract Code, relating to public contracts.
Title
School districts: contracts: formal bids: notices.
Sponsors
Asm. Paul Fong [D] |
Roll Calls
2009-04-01 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-02-02 | From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56. | |
2010-01-31 | Died pursuant to Art. IV, Sec. 10(c) of the Constitution. | |
2009-05-28 | In committee: Set, second hearing. Held under submission. | |
2009-04-23 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. | |
2009-04-15 | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2009-04-14 | Read second time and amended. | |
2009-04-13 | From committee: Amend, do pass as amended, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (April 1). | |
2009-03-25 | Re-referred to Com. on ED. | |
2009-03-24 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on ED. Read second time and amended. | |
2009-03-23 | Referred to Com. on ED. | |
2009-03-01 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 30. | |
2009-02-26 | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Public Contract Code | 20112 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
Public Contract Code | 20112.1 | New Code | See Bill Text |