CA AB695 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 17 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-01-10 - From committee without further action pursuant to Joint Rule 62(a).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Section 27803 of the Vehicle Code, relating to vehicles.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Vehicles: motorcycles: safety helmets: exceptions.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2012-01-09 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 4 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2011-04-25 - Assembly - Set first hearing. Failed passage. Reconsideration granted (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-25 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 4 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2012-01-10 From committee without further action pursuant to Joint Rule 62(a).
2012-01-09 In committee: Set, second hearing. Failed passage.
2012-01-04 From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on TRANS. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on TRANS.
2011-04-25 In committee: Set first hearing. Failed passage. Reconsideration granted.
2011-03-03 Referred to Com. on TRANS.
2011-02-18 From printer. May be heard in committee March 20.
2011-02-17 Read first time. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Vehicle Code27803Amended CodeCitation Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback