CA AB687 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 30 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-23 - Referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D.
Pending: Senate Business, Professions and Economic Development Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on January 30 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-23 - Referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D.
Pending: Senate Business, Professions and Economic Development Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 10006, 10085.5, 10085.6, 10106, 10133.1, 10139, 10147.6, 10148, 10152, 10153, 10158, 10159, 10159.2, 10164, 10167.12, 10171.5, 10176, 10177, 10180, 10185, 10211, 10231.2, 10232.25, 10238, and 10451 of, and to add Sections 10156.9 and 10157.5 to, the Business and Professions Code, relating to real estate, and making an appropriation therefor.
Title
Real estate brokers: limited liability companies.
Sponsors
Asm. Tom Daly [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-01-30 - Assembly - AB 687 Daly Assembly Third Reading (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 24 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-23 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-14 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-02 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary] (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-23 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-14 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-02 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary] (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-23 | Senate | Referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D. |
2020-01-30 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2020-01-30 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 56. Noes 0. Page 3936.) |
2020-01-23 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2020-01-23 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 18. Noes 0.) (January 23). |
2020-01-23 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2020-01-14 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (January 14). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2020-01-08 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2020-01-07 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on JUD. Read second time and amended. |
2019-04-22 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2019-04-02 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 19. Noes 0.) (April 2). Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2019-03-14 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on B. & P. and JUD. |
2019-02-19 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 21. |
2019-02-15 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |