CA AB678 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 2 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-10-02 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 433, Statutes of 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 2 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-10-02 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 433, Statutes of 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to repeal and add Section 14133.07 of, the Welfare and Institutions Code, relating to Medi-Cal.
Title
Medi-Cal: podiatric services.
Sponsors
Asm. Heath Flora [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-08-30 - Assembly - AB 678 Flora Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-08-15 - Senate - Consent Calendar AB678 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-07-03 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-23 - Assembly - AB 678 Flora Assembly Third Reading (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-16 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-02 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-08-15 - Senate - Consent Calendar AB678 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-07-03 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-23 - Assembly - AB 678 Flora Assembly Third Reading (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-16 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-02 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-10-02 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 433, Statutes of 2019. | |
2019-10-02 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2019-09-05 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m. |
2019-08-30 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 75. Noes 0. Page 2890.). |
2019-08-15 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 17 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. |
2019-08-15 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 2183.). |
2019-08-13 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2019-08-12 | Senate | From committee: Be ordered to second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2019-07-08 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2019-07-05 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (July 3). |
2019-06-13 | Senate | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2019-06-06 | Senate | Referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2019-05-24 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2019-05-23 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 1873.) |
2019-05-20 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2019-05-16 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 18. Noes 0.) (May 16). |
2019-04-24 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2019-04-10 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2019-04-09 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. |
2019-04-08 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (April 2). |
2019-03-26 | Assembly | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2019-02-28 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2019-02-19 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 21. |
2019-02-15 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Welfare and Institutions Code | 14133.07 | New Code | See Bill Text |