CA AB676 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 21 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-02-03 - From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 21 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-02-03 - From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 1367.52 to the Health and Safety Code, to add Section 10117.6 to the Insurance Code, and to add Section 14109.7 to the Welfare and Institutions Code, relating to health care coverage.
Title
Health care coverage: postdischarge care needs.
Sponsors
Asm. Steve Fox [D] |
Roll Calls
2013-04-16 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 11 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-02-03 | Assembly | From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56. |
2014-01-31 | Assembly | Died pursuant to Art. IV, Sec. 10(c) of the Constitution. |
2013-05-08 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2013-04-17 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 11. Noes 6.) (April 16). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2013-04-11 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2013-04-10 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HEALTH. Read second time and amended. |
2013-03-04 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2013-02-22 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 24. |
2013-02-21 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Health and Safety Code | 1367.52 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Insurance Code | 10117.6 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Welfare and Institutions Code | 14109.7 | New Code | See Bill Text |