CA AB660 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 9 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-07-11 - Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Hearing: Aug 12 @ 10:00 am in John L. Burton Hearing Room
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

An act to add Section 25402.14 to the Public Resources Code, relating to energy.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Building energy efficiency standards: solar reflectance of roofs.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-09 - Assembly - AB 660 Levine Assembly Third Reading (Y: 61 N: 13 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-01 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 13 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-22 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-07-11SenateRead second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2019-07-10SenateFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 3.) (July 2).
2019-06-24SenateFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on E., U. & C.
2019-06-10SenateIn committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
2019-05-22SenateReferred to Com. on E., U. & C.
2019-05-09SenateIn Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2019-05-09AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 61. Noes 13. Page 1574.)
2019-05-02AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2019-05-01AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 13. Noes 4.) (May 1).
2019-04-23AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 1.) (April 22). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2019-04-09AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on NAT. RES.
2019-04-08AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on NAT. RES. Read second time and amended.
2019-03-25AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on NAT. RES.
2019-03-21AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on NAT. RES. Read second time and amended.
2019-03-21AssemblyReferred to Com. on NAT. RES.
2019-02-19AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee March 21.
2019-02-15AssemblyRead first time. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Public Resources Code25402.13New CodeSee Bill Text
Public Resources Code25402.14New CodeSee Bill Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback