CA AB659 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 15 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-05-16 - In committee: Held under submission.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

An act to add Chapter 3.5 (commencing with Section 14540) to Part 5.3 of Division 3 of Title 2 of the Government Code, relating to transportation.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Transportation: emerging transportation technologies: California Smart City Challenge Grant Program.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-25 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-16AssemblyIn committee: Held under submission.
2019-04-10AssemblyIn committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
2019-03-26AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (March 25). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2019-02-25AssemblyReferred to Com. on TRANS.
2019-02-19AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee March 21.
2019-02-15AssemblyRead first time. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Government Code14540New CodeSee Bill Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback